NJ S4204 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns employment status of individuals with respect to wage and hour and unemployment status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns employment status of individuals with respect to wage and hour and unemployment status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-12-05SenateRecommitted to Senate Labor Committee
2019-11-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-11-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5936 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback