NJ S4226 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2076
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits Department of Labor and Workforce Development to post information of person who violates State wage, benefit and tax laws.
Title
Permits Department of Labor and Workforce Development to post information of person who violates State wage, benefit and tax laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5841 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.366. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-1-2) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A5841 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-4) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4226 (Carry Over) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.366.
A5841 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4226
A5841 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4226