NJ S426 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S648
Note: Carry Foward to future A4450
Note: Carry Over of previous S531
Note: Carry Over of previous A2160
Note: Carry Foward to future A4450
Note: Carry Over of previous S531
Note: Carry Over of previous A2160
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of "landlord" to include rooming and boarding house owners and operators with regard to ordinances holding landlords to certain standards of responsibility.
Title
Revises definition of "landlord" to include rooming and boarding house owners and operators with regard to ordinances holding landlords to certain standards of responsibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S426 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S426 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S531 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3179 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2160 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S426 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S531 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3179 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2160 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S426 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/426_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S426 |