NJ S4281 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2520
Note: Carry Foward to future A4405
Note: Carry Foward to future A4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to sell and convey to Educational Services Commission of New Jersey certain land and improvements known as Piscataway Regional Day School.
Title
Requires State to sell and convey to Educational Services Commission of New Jersey certain land and improvements known as Piscataway Regional Day School.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Joseph Egan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6094 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A6094 |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4281 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S4281 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A6094 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4281
S4281 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A6094 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4281