NJ S434 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1776
Note: Carry Foward to future S1787
Note: Carry Foward to future S215
Note: Carry Over of previous S2505
Note: Carry Over of previous A2558
Note: Carry Foward to future S1787
Note: Carry Foward to future S215
Note: Carry Over of previous S2505
Note: Carry Over of previous A2558
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Vegetation Management Response Act"; concerns vegetation management related to electric public utility infrastructure.
Title
"Vegetation Management Response Act"; concerns vegetation management related to electric public utility infrastructure.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S434 (Carry Over) 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S434 (Carry Over) 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S434 (Carry Over) 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2505 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Senate Amendment (38-0) (Oroho)
A260 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A2558 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S434 (Carry Over) 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S434 (Carry Over) 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2505 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Senate Amendment (38-0) (Oroho)
A260 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A2558 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading