NJ S436 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands DNA database to include samples from disorderly persons.*
Title
Expands DNA database to include samples from disorderly persons.*
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] |
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A468 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A468 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-18-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A468 (1R) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-4) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A468 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S436 (SCS/1R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S436 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S0500/436_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S436 |