NJ S466 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3210
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.3.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.3.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires acceptance of universal dentist application for participation form by dental plan carriers.
Title
Requires acceptance of universal dentist application for participation form by dental plan carriers.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2430 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.3. |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for S2430 (1R) |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3210 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2430 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S466 (1R)
A2430 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S466 (1R)