NJ S487 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4340
Note: Carry Over of previous A491
Note: Carry Over of previous A491
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.151.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.151.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Dominick Marino PFRS Enhanced Benefits for Surviving Spouses Act"; enhances PFRS accidental death benefit for surviving spouse who becomes eligible after effective date by providing for minimum of $50,000 annually.
Title
"Dominick Marino PFRS Enhanced Benefits for Surviving Spouses Act"; enhances PFRS accidental death benefit for surviving spouse who becomes eligible after effective date by providing for minimum of $50,000 annually.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2317 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2317 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.151. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A2317 (1R) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jimenez) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4340 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A491
A2317 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S487 (1R)
A491 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A2317 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S487 (1R)
A491 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session