NJ S493 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3009
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Defines information to be included on death certificates, including gender identification.
Title
Defines information to be included on death certificates, including gender identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1726 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.59. |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (57-10-3) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A1726 (1R) |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-4) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Vitale) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3009 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1726 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Substituted by S493 (1R)
A1726 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Substituted by S493 (1R)