NJ S518 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1228
Note: Carry Foward to future A5412
Note: Carry Over of previous S2993
Note: Carry Foward to future A5412
Note: Carry Over of previous S2993
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to conduct study to determine extent and cause of outmigration of high school graduates to out-of-State colleges.
Title
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to conduct study to determine extent and cause of outmigration of high school graduates to out-of-State colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S518 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S518 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2993 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S518 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2993 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S518 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/518_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S518 |