NJ S521 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3627

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires NJ State Council on Arts to establish "Artist District" designation and select certain municipalities or areas within municipalities for such designation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires NJ State Council on Arts to establish "Artist District" designation and select certain municipalities or areas within municipalities for such designation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3627 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4378 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback