NJ S538 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A172
Note: Carry Over of previous S2579
Note: Carry Over of previous S2579
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.297.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.297.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows long term tax exemption extension for certain low-income housing.*
Title
Allows long term tax exemption extension for certain low-income housing.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2536 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.297. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A2536 (1R) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Oroho) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S538 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.297.
S2579 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A2536 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S538 (3R)
S2579 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A2536 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S538 (3R)