NJ S559 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2536
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns employer inquires about worker's wage and salary experience.
Title
Concerns employer inquires about worker's wage and salary experience.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-10) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2536 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A3480/4119 (ACS)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S559 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/559_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S559 |