NJ S566 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.119.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns radiologic technology licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns radiologic technology licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A950 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-09AssemblyApproved P.L.2013, c.119.
2013-06-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2013-06-24AssemblySubstituted for A950
2013-06-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-06-06AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2013-05-30SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2013-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-01-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A950 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Substituted by S566

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback