NJ S58 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S983
Note: Carry Foward to future A2981
Note: Carry Over of previous A325
Note: Carry Foward to future A2981
Note: Carry Over of previous A325
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires municipalities to file copies of tax abatement and exemption agreements with county chief financial officer and county counsel within 10 days of execution.
Title
Requires municipalities to file copies of tax abatement and exemption agreements with county chief financial officer and county counsel within 10 days of execution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S58 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S58 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A325 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A275 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S58 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A325 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A275 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S58 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/58_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S58 |