NJ S606 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2030

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Passed by the Senate (34-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes New Jersey Statewide Suicide Prevention Coordination and Oversight Council in DHS.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes New Jersey Statewide Suicide Prevention Coordination and Oversight Council in DHS.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2020-09-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2030 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3080 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback