NJ S619 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S389
Note: Carry Foward to future A657
Note: Carry Over of previous S708
Note: Carry Foward to future A657
Note: Carry Over of previous S708
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides transparency and accountability reforms at PANYNJ; modifies governance structure; provides legislative oversight of PANYNJ; and regulates capital planning process.
Title
Provides transparency and accountability reforms at PANYNJ; modifies governance structure; provides legislative oversight of PANYNJ; and regulates capital planning process.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Gordon) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S619 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S619 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S708 (Carry Over) 2016-11-21 - Motion Table (20-15) (Sarlo)
A1708 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S619 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S708 (Carry Over) 2016-11-21 - Motion Table (20-15) (Sarlo)
A1708 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading