NJ S64 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students.
Title
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2574 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2574 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-3) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted for A2574 (1R) |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2574 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S64 (1R)