NJ S688 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1019
Note: Carry Foward to future A4277
Note: Carry Over of previous S500
Note: Carry Foward to future A4277
Note: Carry Over of previous S500
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the four-year "New Jersey Early Innovation Inspiration School Grant Pilot Program" in DOE to fund non-traditional Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics programs for students in grades K through 8.
Title
Establishes the four-year "New Jersey Early Innovation Inspiration School Grant Pilot Program" in DOE to fund non-traditional Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics programs for students in grades K through 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S688 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S688 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S500 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S688 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S500 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S688 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/688_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S688 |