NJ S703 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2145
Note: Carry Over of previous S4192
Note: Carry Over of previous A5955
Note: Carry Over of previous S4192
Note: Carry Over of previous A5955
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.79.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.79.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health care professionals to undergo explicit and implicit bias training.
Title
Requires certain health care professionals to undergo explicit and implicit bias training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1079 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1079 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.79. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-1) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-20-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A1079 (2R) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-7) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S703 (Carry Over) 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.79.
S4192 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1079 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S703 (3R)
A5955 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S4192 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1079 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S703 (3R)
A5955 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee