NJ S73 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S671
Note: Carry Over of previous A2354
Note: Carry Over of previous A2354
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for sale of cottage baked goods.
Title
Establishes requirements for sale of cottage baked goods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4580 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4580 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A4580 (1R) |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (38-0) (Bateman) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S671 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4580 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S73 (3R)
A2354 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4580 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S73 (3R)
A2354 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee