NJ S746 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2393
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.41.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.41.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain audiologists to dispense and fit hearing aids.
Title
Permits certain audiologists to dispense and fit hearing aids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3045 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3045 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.41. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted for A3045 (1R) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2393 (Carry Over) 2016-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3045 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S746 (1R)
A3045 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S746 (1R)