NJ S763 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1281
Note: Carry Over of previous S991
Note: Carry Over of previous S991
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and renames NJSTARS; repeals NJSTARS II; establishes NJ HonorScholars Program.
Title
Revises and renames NJSTARS; repeals NJSTARS II; establishes NJ HonorScholars Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S763 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S991 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2769 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S991 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2769 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading