NJ S781 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S534
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.216.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.216.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises penalties for certain violations of law by public movers and warehousemen.
Title
Revises penalties for certain violations of law by public movers and warehousemen.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] |
Rep. Amy Handlin [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4884 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4884 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.216. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4884/3617 (ACS/2R) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Sarlo) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S534 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3617 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Combined with A4884 (ACS)
A4884 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S781 (4R)
A3617 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Combined with A4884 (ACS)
A4884 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S781 (4R)