NJ S794 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S537
Note: Carry Foward to future A3110
Note: Carry Over of previous S368
Note: Carry Foward to future A3110
Note: Carry Over of previous S368
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain minimum and maximum temperatures in emergency shelters, rooming and boarding houses, and certain nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Title
Establishes certain minimum and maximum temperatures in emergency shelters, rooming and boarding houses, and certain nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S794 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S794 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S368 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2942 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S794 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S368 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2942 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee