NJ S806 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S539
Note: Carry Foward to future A3109
Note: Carry Over of previous S3037
Note: Carry Foward to future A3109
Note: Carry Over of previous S3037
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes confidentiality of landlord-tenant court records; addresses adverse actions on rental applications.
Title
Establishes confidentiality of landlord-tenant court records; addresses adverse actions on rental applications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S806 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3037 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2938 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S806 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3037 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2938 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S806 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/806_I1.HTM |