NJ S818 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3037
Note: Carry Over of previous A4476
Note: Carry Over of previous A4476
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-27 - Approved P.L.2021, c.255.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-27 - Approved P.L.2021, c.255.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits transmittal of certain proposed county ordinances by electronic mail.
Title
Permits transmittal of certain proposed county ordinances by electronic mail.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2284 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2284 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.255. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A2284 |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3037 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2284 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S818
A4476 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2284 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S818
A4476 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading