NJ S831 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes notification signage, and monitoring requirements related to combined sewer overflows.*
Title
Establishes notification signage, and monitoring requirements related to combined sewer overflows.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2852 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2852 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-4) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-18-1) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A2852 (1R) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2852 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S831 (2R)