NJ S84 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3150
Note: Carry Over of previous A4728
Note: Carry Over of previous A4728
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.208.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.208.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education and public and nonpublic high schools and middle schools to adopt anti-hazing policies; expands activities encompassing criminal hazing and upgrades penalties for engaging in these activities.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education and public and nonpublic high schools and middle schools to adopt anti-hazing policies; expands activities encompassing criminal hazing and upgrades penalties for engaging in these activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3149 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3149 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.208. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A3149 (ACS/1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3150 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3149 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S84/2093 (SCS/2R)
A4728 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3149 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S84/2093 (SCS/2R)
A4728 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee