NJ S847 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1144
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to provide daily recess period for students in grade kindergarten through 5; permits denial of recess for violation of code of student conduct but student must be provided restorative justice activities.*
Title
Requires school districts to provide daily recess period for students in grade kindergarten through 5; permits denial of recess for violation of code of student conduct but student must be provided restorative justice activities.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4076 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.73. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-3) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A4076 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment (35-0) (Turner) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1144 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1076 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4076 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S847 (3R)
A1076 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4076 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S847 (3R)