NJ S848 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4066

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises requirements for health care service firms to report financial information to Division of Consumer Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises requirements for health care service firms to report financial information to Division of Consumer Affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2140 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2020-10-29SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-10-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2020-10-29AssemblySubstituted for A2140 (1R)
2020-10-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4066 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A2140 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S848 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback