NJ S853 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1398
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.119.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.119.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Buy American Act"; requires certain State agency highway and bridge construction contracts to include iron and steel products made in U.S.
Title
"New Jersey Buy American Act"; requires certain State agency highway and bridge construction contracts to include iron and steel products made in U.S.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5064 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5064 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.119. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A5064 |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S853 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.119.
A5064 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S853 (1R)
A5064 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S853 (1R)