NJ S860 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3752
Note: Carry Over of previous A4422
Note: Carry Over of previous A4422
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act"; provides for uniform regulation of small wireless facility deployment in NJ.
Title
"Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act"; provides for uniform regulation of small wireless facility deployment in NJ.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3752 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4422 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A4422 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S860 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/860_I1.HTM |