NJ S865 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S891
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Approved P.L.2018, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Approved P.L.2018, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits public-private partnership agreements for certain building and highway infrastructure projects; provides for EDA oversight.
Title
Permits public-private partnership agreements for certain building and highway infrastructure projects; provides for EDA oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1299 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1299 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.90. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-3-0) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (Greenwald) (72-3-0) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A1299 (3R) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-2) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (37-1) (Oroho) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-1) (Sweeney) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Oroho) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S891 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1299 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by S865 (3R)
A1299 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by S865 (3R)