NJ S883 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.134.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes issuance of special Humane State license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes issuance of special Humane State license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2197 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-01AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.134.
2018-09-27AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
2018-09-27AssemblySubstituted for A2197
2018-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-02-26SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-02-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-01-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2197 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Substituted by S883 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback