NJ S887 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.151.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.151.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to contract with third party entity to apply risk reduction model to Medicaid prescription drug services.
Title
Requires DHS to contract with third party entity to apply risk reduction model to Medicaid prescription drug services.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4790 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4790 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.151. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A4790 (ACS) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4790 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S887 (SCS/1R)