NJ S889 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4022
Note: Carry Foward to future A2427
Note: Carry Foward to future S634
Note: Carry Over of previous S943
Note: Carry Foward to future A2427
Note: Carry Foward to future S634
Note: Carry Over of previous S943
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/2221 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/2221 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"The Reliability, Preparedness, and Storm Response Act of 2012"; requires public utilities to file certain information concerning emergency preparedness with BPU and increases certain penalties.
Title
"The Reliability, Preparedness, and Storm Response Act of 2012"; requires public utilities to file certain information concerning emergency preparedness with BPU and increases certain penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Combined with S719/2221 (SCS) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S889 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/2221 (SCS)
S889 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/2221 (SCS)
S889 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/2221 (SCS)
S943 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A716 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S889 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/2221 (SCS)
S889 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/2221 (SCS)
S943 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A716 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S889 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/889_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S889 |