NJ S938 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4222
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards for installation of electric vehicle charging stations; authorizes municipal deviation from standards; exempts installation at gasoline service station from certain requirements.
Title
Establishes standards for installation of electric vehicle charging stations; authorizes municipal deviation from standards; exempts installation at gasoline service station from certain requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-1) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4222 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2108 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S3223 (1R)
A5032 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Combined with A2108 (ACS)
A2108 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S3223 (1R)
A5032 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Combined with A2108 (ACS)