NJ S939 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S891
Note: Carry Over of previous S831
Note: Carry Over of previous S831
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.389.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.389.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires forms and materials for individuals with developmental disabilities to be available in languages other than English.
Title
Requires forms and materials for individuals with developmental disabilities to be available in languages other than English.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3331 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3331 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.389. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-2-1) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A3331 (2R) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-0) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S939 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.389.
S831 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3331 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S939 (2R)
S831 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3331 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S939 (2R)