NJ S954 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S103

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.172.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Enters New Jersey in enhanced multistate Nurse Licensure Compact.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enters New Jersey in enhanced multistate Nurse Licensure Compact.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1597 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.172.
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A1597 (2R)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-21SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S103 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1597 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S954/1699 (SCS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback