NJ S992 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2135

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices at pharmacies and certain businesses with on-site pharmacies.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices at pharmacies and certain businesses with on-site pharmacies.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-09-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2135 (Carry Over) 2016-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1723 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback