NJ SCR110 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous ACR140

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes constitutional amendment to extend veterans' property tax deduction to continuing care retirement communities.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes constitutional amendment to extend veterans' property tax deduction to continuing care retirement communities.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR134 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2019-06-20AssemblyResolution Passed Assembly (78-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for ACR134 (2R)
2019-06-06AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-05-30SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-12-06SenatePublic Hearing Held SMV
2018-10-29SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
2018-10-29SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
2018-10-29SenateSenate Amendment (36-0) (Gopal)
2018-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (35-0) (Gopal)
2018-06-21SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
2018-06-21SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-31SenateTransferred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR134 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by SCR110 (2R)
ACR140 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback