NJ SCR118 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to require interstate natural gas pipelines constructed in N.J. to conform with N.J. regulations for intrastate natural gas pipelines.
Title
Urges President and Congress to require interstate natural gas pipelines constructed in N.J. to conform with N.J. regulations for intrastate natural gas pipelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-3) |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR164 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR118 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/118_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR118 |