NJ SCR118 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR186
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes cultural, religious, and interfaith importance of Shri Guru Granth Sahib Ji as "Living Guru" of Sikhs in promoting peace and declaring Sikhs as distinct ethnic and religious minority.
Title
Recognizes cultural, religious, and interfaith importance of Shri Guru Granth Sahib Ji as "Living Guru" of Sikhs in promoting peace and declaring Sikhs as distinct ethnic and religious minority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR138 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR138 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR138 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
ACR138 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by SCR118
SCR186 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
SCR186 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SCR118 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SCR/118_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR118 |