NJ SCR129 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Substituted by ACR144 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Substituted by ACR144 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to fully fund recently passed federal legislation increasing veteran plot allowances. *
Title
Urges Congress to fully fund recently passed federal legislation increasing veteran plot allowances. *
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Sen. James Whelan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Substituted by ACR144 (1R) | |
2011-03-10 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-10-18 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR144 (Same As) 2011-05-05 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SCR129 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SCR/129_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SCR/129_R1.HTM |