NJ SCR129 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Substituted by ACR179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Substituted by ACR179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges NJT to provide bus service in Borough of Helmetta.
Title
Urges NJT to provide bus service in Borough of Helmetta.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Substituted by ACR179 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR179 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SCR129 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SCR/129_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR129 |