NJ SCR134 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR30
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR80
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR259
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR80
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR259
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment to make State trustee of public natural resources and guarantee to the people other environmental rights.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment to make State trustee of public natural resources and guarantee to the people other environmental rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR134 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
SCR134 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
ACR85 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
ACR259 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
SCR134 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
ACR85 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
ACR259 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR134 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/134_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR134 |