NJ SCR135 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges cooperative approach among all levels of government to provide funding and other resources to clean up plastic pollution.
Title
Urges cooperative approach among all levels of government to provide funding and other resources to clean up plastic pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR198 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR198 |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR198 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SCR135
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR135 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/135_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR135 |