NJ SCR137 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR81
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges DEP and EDA to establish plastics recycling marketplace.
Title
Urges DEP and EDA to establish plastics recycling marketplace.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR137 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR197 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR197 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR137 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/137_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR137 |