NJ SCR151 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by ACR204 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by ACR204 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges New Jersey Supreme Court to promote public awareness campaign for food growers to register as placement worksites for community service programs.
Title
Urges New Jersey Supreme Court to promote public awareness campaign for food growers to register as placement worksites for community service programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted by ACR204 (1R) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR204 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Filed with Secretary of State